Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriano Calderina

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 May 1438AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Jul 1438AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
6 Feb 1442AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
5 Nov 1466AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
Jan 1472³DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Calderina
Bishop Valeriano Calderina (died Jan 1472) Bishop of Albenga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 227, and Page 229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 84, and Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast