Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Boniface (Winfrid, Winifred) , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany

Archbishop of Utrecht


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
672¹Born
70230.0Ordained PriestPriest
723¹51.0AppointedBishop
30 Nov 72351.9Ordained BishopBishop
732¹60.0AppointedArchbishop
739²67.0AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
74573.0AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 75482.4DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Boniface (Winfrid, Winifred)
Archbishop St. Boniface (Winfrid, Winifred) O.S.B. (born 672, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWessex
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • fn: CB, 5 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Number 8,145
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Nov 2020

Quantcast