Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Baccino

Deceased

Bishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1905Born
28 Oct 192823.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 195550.6AppointedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
11 Mar 195650.8Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
5 Jul 197570.1DiedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Luis Baccino
Bishop Luis Baccino (born , died ) Bishop of San José de Mayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Basilica, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,638

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast