Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antioco Azzei

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1761Born
8 Jun 180442.4SelectedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
24 Sep 180442.7ConfirmedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
25 Aug 180543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
27 Feb 181957.1SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
29 Mar 181957.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
4 Dec 182159.9DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antioco Azzei
Archbishop Giovanni Antioco Azzei (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOristano, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 85, and Page 111
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast