Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yaser Rasmi Hanna Al-Ayyash

Protosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1955 Born
12 Jul 198731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
21 Jun 200751.5SelectedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
26 Jun 200751.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
13 Oct 200751.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
14 Apr 201559.3ResignedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
9 Feb 201862.1AppointedProtosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

MicroData Summary for Yaser Rasmi Hanna Al-Ayyash
Archbishop Yaser Rasmi Hanna Al-Ayyash (born ) Protosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShatana
Ordained BishopSaint Georges, Cathedral, Amman

Please contact the Archbishop through the Patriarchal Dependent Territory of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,552
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2015
  • c1: CB, 19 Jul 2017
  • ab: CB, 10 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast