Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge de Ataíde

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1535Born
23 Jul 156833.2AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
7 Nov 156833.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
4 Jul 157843.1ResignedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
17 Jan 161175.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Ataíde (VIAF: 167117899)
Bishop Jorge de Ataíde (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viseu

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Graça, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,045
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 335
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 16
  • b/c2+: CB, 22 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast