Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo Afonso de Meneses

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1581AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
25 Feb 1582Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
14 Jul 1587DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joćo Afonso de Meneses
Archbishop Joćo Afonso de Meneses (died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast