Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Manuel de Ataíde

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹Born
1 Mar 159726.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 160938.9AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
21 Mar 161039.2Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
27 Jul 162453.5SelectedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Feb 162554.1ConfirmedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
24 Nov 163261.8AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal
4 Jun 163362.4DiedArchbishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Manuel de Ataíde
Archbishop João Manuel de Ataíde (born 1571, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa
Ordained BishopGraça, Church, Lisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 371, and Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 4
  • op/d: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast