Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Enrique 聲gel Angelelli Carletti

Deceased

Bishop of La Rioja, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1923Born
9 Oct 194926.2Ordained PriestPriest of C鏎doba, Argentina
12 Dec 196037.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of C鏎doba, Argentina
12 Dec 196037.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
12 Mar 196137.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
3 Jul 196844.9AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
24 Aug 196845.0InstalledBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
5 Aug 197653.0DiedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
27 Apr 2019Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Enrique 聲gel Angelelli Carletti (VIAF: 309776359)
Bishop Bl. Enrique 聲gel Angelelli Carletti (born , died ) Bishop of La Rioja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceC鏎doba, Archdiocese of C鏎doba
Ordained BishopAsunci鏮, Cathedral, C鏎doba, Archdiocese of C鏎doba
Death PlacePunta de los Llanos

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 9 Jun 2018
  • beat: CB, 23 Oct 2018
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations 夗iscopales, Year 1961, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022