Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Alphonsus Álvares, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626²Born
1641²15.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
19 Dec 169165.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
2 Aug 169367.5Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
24 Nov 170882.8DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Alphonsus Álvares
Bishop Gaspar Alphonsus Álvares S.J. (born 1626, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbre, Diocese of Coimbra, Portugal
Ordained BishopGoa, Archdiocese of Goa

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 27
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,786
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast