Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop ╔mile Augustin Allgeyer, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar, Kenya

Titular Bishop of Ticelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1856Born
7 Jun 188428.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Nov 188428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Feb 189740.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Zanguebar, Kenya
17 Feb 189740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ticelia
25 Apr 189741.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ticelia
3 Apr 191356.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
9 Apr 192467.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for ╔mile Augustin Allgeyer
(WikiData: Q1335800)
Bishop ╔mile Augustin Allgeyer C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanzibar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRixheim, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained DeaconHoly Spirit Seminary, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestMissions' Seminary, Chapel, Chevilly, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopKnechtsteden, Abbey, Dormagen, Archdiocese of K÷ln {Cologne}, Germany
Death PlaceChevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 553
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1897, Number 11
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 28 Jul 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 4 Sep 2023