Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Adezario, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1631Born
19 Dec 165423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
1 Jul 167140.0AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
19 Jul 167140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
Aug 1711³80.1DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Adezario
Bishop Alessandro Adezario C.R.L. (born , died Aug 1711) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre au Mont, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast