Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Abraham Theophilos Kalapurakal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India

Titular Bishop of Ammaedara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1891Born
1924¹32.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 192937.9Ordained BishopBishop
20 Sep 193039.5Converted
13 Feb 193240.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
11 Jun 193241.3AppointedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jul 195059.4ResignedBishop of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India
25 Jul 195059.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
27 Jun 195665.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla (Syro-Malankara), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacob Abraham Theophilos Kalapurakal
Bishop Jacob Abraham Theophilos Kalapurakal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruvalla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlasha
Ordained BishopNiranam

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast