Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia

Apostolicus Vicariatus Sancti Andreae et Providentiae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 5 December 2000
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 57 (22 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Avenida 20 de Julio, Via a San Luis 4-140, Isla de San Andres, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)512.6457; 512.0493
  • Fax: 512.6685

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of San Andrés y Providencia
20 June 1912ErectedArchdiocese of Cartagena Mission "Sui Iuris" of San Andrés y Providencia (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia
14 November 1946ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of San Andrés y Providencia Prefecture Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia
Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia
5 December 2000ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia
19501,5467,50020.6%1453094202ap1951
19658,90015,60057.1%3581,11210234ap1967
196813,40017,50076.6%4591,4886267ap1971
197617,50024,50071.4%3472,5009275ap1977
198020,50030,80066.6%2463,4169256ap1981
199034,00055,00061.8%4484,2505267ap1991
199950,25079,25063.4%5386,2814268ap2000
Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia
200032,42053,56260.5%55103,24226268ap2001
200133,91057,93758.5%55103,39125269ap2002
200242,00070,00060.0%93123,50024249ap2003
200344,00075,00058.7%94133,38425269ap2004
200450,00080,00062.5%95143,57126269ap2005
201063,00092,00068.5%172193,315221510ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011