Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugenio (Juan Bautista) da Carcagente (Soler Rodríguez), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of San Andrés y Providencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1865BornCarcaixent, Spain
23 Jul 192661.5AppointedSuperior of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia
14 Nov 194681.8AppointedPrefect of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia
21 Oct 195287.7DiedPrefect of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eugenio (Juan Bautista) da Carcagente (Soler Rodríguez):
Priest Eugenio (Juan Bautista) da Carcagente (Soler Rodríguez) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of San Andrés y Providencia

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013