Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincenzo Cimatti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Miyazaki, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1879Born
19 Mar 190525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Aug 192849.0AppointedSuperior of Miyazaki, Japan
28 Jan 193555.5AppointedPrefect of Miyazaki, Japan
21 Nov 194061.3ResignedPrefect of Miyazaki, Japan
6 Oct 196586.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Miyazaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cimatti
Father Vincenzo Cimatti S.D.B. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Miyazaki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Italy
Death PlaceTokyo, Archdiocese of Tōkyō

  • a priest for 60.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • d: CB, 2 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast