Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mykola Matwijiwskij

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1962 Born
27 Sep 200644.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
17 May 200744.9Ordained PriestPriest of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
1 Sep 201957.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
21 Mar 202057.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Mykola Matwijiwskij
Father Mykola Matwijiwskij (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Holy Family of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoventry, England

Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • b: CB, 1 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast