Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alphonse Chantoux, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1920Born
8 Sep 193919.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Apr 194626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 May 195939.3AppointedPrefect of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
16 Jun 196444.3ResignedPrefect of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
18 Oct 199878.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Chantoux (VIAF: 268183577)
Father Alphonse Chantoux C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Fada N’Gourma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes, France
Ordained PriestDreux

  • a priest for 52.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast