Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martinus H. M. Bodéwes, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Bangassou, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1914Born
23 Aug 193521.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jul 194026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 Mar 195540.6AppointedPrefect of Bangassou, Central African Republic
10 Feb 196449.6ResignedPrefect of Bangassou, Central African Republic
2011²96.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Bangassou, Central African Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martinus H. M. Bodéwes (VIAF: 284983052)
Father Martinus H. M. Bodéwes C.S.Sp. (born , died 2011) Prefect Emeritus of Bangassou

EventPlace
Birth PlacePannerden

  • a priest for 70.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 31 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast