Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Yusta y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1718³BornValfermoso de las Monjas
10 Sep 177051.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
28 Oct 177052.0Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
17 Feb 177758.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
Dec 1787³69.1DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Yusta y Navarro:
Bishop Baltasar Yusta y Navarro (born , died Dec 1787) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 183, and Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015