Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of York

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1246AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
14 Jul 1247Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
31 Jan 1256DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of York:
Bishop William of York (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015