Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Ximenes

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1620AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
22 Nov 1620Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
3 Nov 1633DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ximenes:
Bishop Tommaso Ximenes (died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 187
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 69, Number 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013