Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelmus Antonius Ferdinand Wulfingh, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1839Born
15 Oct 186223.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Oct 186728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Jul 188950.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
30 Jul 188950.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
15 Dec 188950.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
5 Apr 190666.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus Antonius Ferdinand Wulfingh (VIAF: 284589848)
Bishop Wilhelmus Antonius Ferdinand Wulfingh C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

EventPlace
Birth Place’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bois-le-Duc, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017