Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Wickhampton

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1271SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
13 May 1274Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
24 Apr 1284DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Wickhampton
Bishop Robert Wickhampton (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 597

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast