Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Sorribas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1631BornValencia
27 Jun 164716.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
25 Sep 167342.2AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1 Apr 167442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
24 Nov 167847.4DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Sorribas:
Bishop Juan Bautista Sorribas O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 211, Number 1,315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015