Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Acacio March de Velasco, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornValencia
26 Jan 166075.0AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
Apr 1660²75.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
1 May 166075.3InstalledBishop of Orihuela, Spain
27 May 166580.4DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Acacio March de Velasco:
Bishop Acacio March de Velasco O.P. (died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c24: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 191, Number 1,202
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015