Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Visdelou, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou]

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1656BornSchloss Bienassis en Pleneuf
5 Sep 167317.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
12 Jan 170851.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou], China
12 Jan 170851.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
2 Feb 170952.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
11 Nov 173781.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou], China

MicroData Summary for Claude Visdelou:
Bishop Claude Visdelou S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou]

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jun 2015