Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Verdugo Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1561BornCarmona, Spain
14 Mar 162260.6AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
27 Dec 162261.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
20 Jul 163675.0DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
9 Sep 163675.1AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Verdugo Cabrera:
Bishop Francisco Verdugo Cabrera (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 199
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013