Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore di Aloisio

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1667³Born
24 Mar 169326.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 169326.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 171952.3AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
21 May 171952.3Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
Aug 1729³62.5DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore di Aloisio
Bishop Salvatore di Aloisio (born , died Aug 1729) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017