Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grgo Ilijić, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ruspae

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1736BornVareš
1752¹15.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
30 Sep 179659.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia
30 Sep 179659.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
28 May 179760.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
1 Jun 179962.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia
1 Mar 181376.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Ottoman), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grgo Ilijić
Bishop Grgo Ilijić O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ruspae

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 327
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016