Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Valdés Herrera

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578BornValladolid
19 Dec 163356.0AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
19 Mar 163456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
23 Jun 163658.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
21 May 164163.4SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
21 Oct 164163.8ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
13 Jul 165375.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
10 Nov 165375.9ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
13 Apr 165779.3DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Valdés Herrera:
Bishop Antonio Valdés Herrera (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 164, and Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013