Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Broglia

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1552Born
20 Nov 159240.1AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
30 Nov 159240.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
8 Feb 161764.3DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Broglia (VIAF: 88847802)
Archbishop Carlo Broglia (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieri, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Atanasio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309
  • b/c2: AT, 23 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017