Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Boldrini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1511Born
7 Feb 156755.7AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
13 Apr 156755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
2 Nov 157463.5DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Boldrini
Bishop Gregorio Boldrini O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Death PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Buried Place (Original)San Domenico, Church, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 5*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234
  • b/c2+: AT, 31 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast