Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Ferreira de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1750BornCoimbra
20 Sep 177727.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 179444.0SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1 Jun 179544.8ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
13 Sep 179545.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
26 Apr 180150.7DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Ferreira de Carvalho
Bishop Joaquim Ferreira de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016