Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Trivulzio

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1605²Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 1621AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
Apr 1621³Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
22 Aug 1631DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Trivulzio
Bishop Francesco Trivulzio (died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 263
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,621, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast