Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislao Vincenzo Tomba, B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1782BornBologna
17 Dec 183250.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
23 Dec 183250.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
1 Feb 183653.8AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
21 Apr 184563.0AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
5 Feb 184764.8DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Vincenzo Tomba:
Archbishop Stanislao Vincenzo Tomba B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 130, and Page 197
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013