Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Watson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1557AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
15 Aug 1557Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
25 Jun 1559ResignedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
27 Sep 1584DiedBishop Emeritus of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Watson:
Bishop Thomas Watson (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013