Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Tesorieri

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1825Born
23 Jan 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187146.5AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
30 Nov 187146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
2 Apr 190176.0DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Tesorieri
Bishop Luigi Tesorieri (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Diocese of Forli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Imola, Diocese of Imola

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,871, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast