Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe del Pozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1662Born
27 Dec 168725.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 171855.2AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
27 Feb 171855.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
Aug 1723³60.7DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe del Pozzo
Bishop Giuseppe del Pozzo (born , died Aug 1723) Bishop of Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontes Aurei

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast