Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Cardinal Taverna

Deceased

Bishop of Novara

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558²BornMilano
15 Oct 159638.7AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
17 Mar 159840.2ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
9 Jun 160446.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160446.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
16 Nov 161557.8AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
7 Dec 161557.9Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
29 Aug 161961.6DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Taverna (VIAF: 69043990)
Ferdinando Cardinal Taverna (born 1558, died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
  • a cardinal for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 31
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016