Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Roberti

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1665Born
20 Sep 168722.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 168924.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 170843.3AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
27 Nov 171348.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Policastro, Italy
8 Apr 174781.8DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Roberti
Archbishop Andrea Roberti (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiffoni Sei Casali

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319, and Page 327
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast