Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Kaznowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1673³BornNeoforen
16 Jun 169622.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 169824.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 172955.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
7 Sep 172955.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
20 Nov 172956.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
1732¹58.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Kaznowski:
Bishop Franciszek Kaznowski (born , died 1732) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,454
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015