Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Skarbek

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1661³BornSokolowicz
26 Oct 168725.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 168725.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 169634.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
2 Jan 169634.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
30 Jan 171351.0AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
2 Dec 173371.9DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Skarbek:
Archbishop Jan Skarbek (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 46.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243, and Page 257
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015