Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Swinkels, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1810Born
20 Sep 183424.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 184534.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Sep 186555.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
12 Sep 186555.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amorium
15 Oct 186555.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amorium
11 Sep 187565.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Swinkels
Bishop Johannes Baptist Swinkels C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoensel, Netherlands

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 96
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017