Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes van Genk

Deceased

Bishop of Breda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1803BornPrincenhage
20 Feb 182723.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 185046.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Breda, Netherlands
22 Mar 185046.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrana
1 May 185147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrana
4 Mar 185349.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Breda, Netherlands
25 Apr 186864.6SucceededBishop of Breda, Netherlands
10 Mar 187470.5DiedBishop of Breda, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes van Genk:
Bishop Johannes van Genk (born , died ) Bishop of Breda

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 76, and Page 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013