Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Antonius Stratman, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia

Titular See: (Innocent de la Presentation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1689BornH÷nningen, Germany
21 Nov 170819.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
3 Mar 173848.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
3 Mar 173848.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
19 Jan 174656.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
14 Aug 174657.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
6 Jun 175364.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Joannes Antonius Stratman:
Bishop Joannes Antonius Stratman O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1746, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015