Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Spridlington

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Asaph, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1376AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
25 May 1376Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
9 Apr 1382DiedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Spridlington:
Bishop William Spridlington (died ) Bishop of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 112
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013