Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cicala (Cicada)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
30 Mar 155424.2AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
1557¹27.0Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
1572¹42.0ResignedBishop of Albenga, Italy
15 Jun 157343.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
25 Feb 157646.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cicala (Cicada)
Bishop Carlo Cicala (Cicada) (born 1530) Bishop Emeritus of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 261
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast