Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Thomas von Spaur

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1565AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Jun 1565AppointedTitular Bishop of Maioren
5 Mar 1570Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maioren
5 Jul 1578SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Feb 1591DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Thomas von Spaur (VIAF: 80662772)
Bishop Johann Thomas von Spaur (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141, and Page 233
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,570, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast