Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eucharius Sang

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
16 Feb 159843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
16 Feb 159843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
8 Sep 159944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
11 Mar 162065.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eucharius Sang (VIAF: 209451701)
Bishop Eucharius Sang (born 1555, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMellrichstadt
Ordained BishopWürzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Oct 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast